This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2019 at 06:16:24 (UTC).

FILIBERTO LOMELI, ET AL. VS GALAXY AUTO MALL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 FILIBERTO LOMELI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GALAXY AUTO MALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0017

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOMELI FILIBERTO

LOMELI STEPHANIE

Defendants

GALAXY AUTO MALL

VEROS CREDIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LARA PAULIANA N

3700 Eagle Rock Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90065

FALER MATTHEW

3700 Eagle Rock Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90065

Defendant Attorney

TENNANT ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/17/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/17/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

1/9/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/9/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/9/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/9/2019: Complaint

Affidavit

1/9/2019: Affidavit

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/25/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Service by Posting

1/24/2019: Proof of Service by Posting

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/28/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons

1/9/2019: Summons

Proof of Service by Mail

3/13/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

3/11/2019: Answer

Minute Order

7/30/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

7/25/2019: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

7/10/2019: Case Management Statement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action; Party recovering less than $10,000 by this action); Filed by Filiberto Lomeli (Plaintiff); Stephanie Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Filiberto Lomeli (Plaintiff); Stephanie Lomeli (Plaintiff); Pauliana N Lara (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Veros Credit (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Veros Credit (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Proof of Service by Posting; Filed by Filiberto Lomeli (Plaintiff); Stephanie Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Filiberto Lomeli (Plaintiff); Stephanie Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Affidavit (Affidavit of Venue by Plaintiffs); Filed by Filiberto Lomeli (Plaintiff); Stephanie Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Filiberto Lomeli (Plaintiff); Stephanie Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by Filiberto Lomeli (Plaintiff); Stephanie Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Filiberto Lomeli (Plaintiff); Stephanie Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY AUTO MALL A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM is a litigant

Latest cases where Veros Credit, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TENNANT ROBERT