Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 04:38:02 (UTC).

FIDENCIO RUVALCABA VS GUNGADIN RESTAURANT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 FIDENCIO RUVALCABA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GUNGADIN RESTAURANT, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3261

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUVALCABA FIDENCIO

Defendants

GANGADIN RESTAURANT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GUNGADIN RESTAURANT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GUNGADIN RESTAURANT INC.

GANGADIN RESTAURANT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ROBISON CLINTON DAVIS

Other Attorneys

CHAMI POUYA B. ESQ.

CHAMI POUYA B.

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/11/2021: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/18/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/18/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/18/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/12/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • Hearing05/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Hearing05/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gungadin Restaurant, Inc. (Defendant); Gangadin Restaurant, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Fidencio Ruvalcaba (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Fidencio Ruvalcaba (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fidencio Ruvalcaba (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fidencio Ruvalcaba (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fidencio Ruvalcaba (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMI POUYA B.