This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 06:11:53 (UTC).

FIDENCIO RIGOBERTO RAMOS JR VS MARNA LYNN FULCHER ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 FIDENCIO RIGOBERTO RAMOS JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARNA LYNN FULCHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9991

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RAMOS FIDENCIO RIGOBERTO JR.

Defendants and Respondents

FULCHER MARNA LYNN

FULCHERSMITH MARNA LYNN

SMITRY JEFFREY LEE

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA

FULCHER-SMITH MARNA LYNN

UHAUL

SMITRY PATRICIA ANN

U-HAUL

U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL INC.

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MARZBAN MICHAEL M. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

EVANS JAMES R. JR. ESQ.

GARRETTY SEAN P.

CHADWICK CRISTYN NICOLE

HAYNES-GARRETTY REETHA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT;AND ETC.

9/6/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT;AND ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR AN ORDER STAYING THE ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF THE ARBITRATION BROUGHT BY DEFENDANTS U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA AND U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL, INC

9/28/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR AN ORDER STAYING THE ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF THE ARBITRATION BROUGHT BY DEFENDANTS U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA AND U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL, INC

DECLARATION OF CRISTYN N. CHADWICK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS U HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA FOR ITSELF AND FOR ERRONEOUSLY SUED DEFENDANT UHAUL A.K.A. UHAUL AND UHAUL INTERNATIONAL INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARB

9/28/2018: DECLARATION OF CRISTYN N. CHADWICK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS U HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA FOR ITSELF AND FOR ERRONEOUSLY SUED DEFENDANT UHAUL A.K.A. UHAUL AND UHAUL INTERNATIONAL INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARB

DECLARATION OF CHAD R. FERREN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS U HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA FOR ITSELF AND ERRONEOULSLY SUED DEFENDANT UHAUL AKA UHAUL AND UHAUL INTERNATIONAL INC.S;AND ETC.

9/28/2018: DECLARATION OF CHAD R. FERREN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS U HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA FOR ITSELF AND ERRONEOULSLY SUED DEFENDANT UHAUL AKA UHAUL AND UHAUL INTERNATIONAL INC.S;AND ETC.

Opposition

10/10/2018: Opposition

Declaration

10/10/2018: Declaration

Reply

10/16/2018: Reply

Supplemental Declaration

10/16/2018: Supplemental Declaration

Notice of Joinder

10/17/2018: Notice of Joinder

Objection

10/19/2018: Objection

Objection

10/19/2018: Objection

Order

10/23/2018: Order

Minute Order

10/23/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

10/23/2018: Unknown

Notice

10/30/2018: Notice

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/5/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice

11/15/2018: Notice

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Notice (Entry of Order to Arbitrate All Claims And Stay State Court Action pending Completion of Arbitration); Filed by U-Haul Co. of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (AND FOR AN ORDER STAYING THE ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF THE ARBITRATION) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • at 08:32 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (AND FOR AN ORDER STAYING THE ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF THE ARBITRATION) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Stipulation To Arbitrate All Claims And Stay State Court Action Pending Completion Of arbitration; [Proposed] Order); Filed by U-Haul Co. of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF REETHA HAYNES-GARRETTY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIESIN SUPPORT THEREOF; Filed by Marna Lynn Fulcher (Defendant); Jeffrey Lee Smitry (Defendant); Patricia Ann Smitry (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Notice (of Continuance); Filed by U-Haul Co. of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Fidencio Rigoberto Jr. Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Fidencio Rigoberto Jr. Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Fidencio Rigoberto Jr. Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Fidencio Rigoberto Jr. Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE 2. GENERAL NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Fidencio Rigoberto Jr. Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fidencio Rigoberto Jr. Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC669991    Hearing Date: August 17, 2020    Dept: F47

Dept. F-47

Date: 8/17/20

Case #BC669991

MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION

Motion filed on 4/9/20.

MOVING PARTY: Defendants U-Haul Co. of California (“UHCA”) and U-Haul International, Inc.

RESPONDING PARTY: all other parties

NOTICE: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order clarifying whether the court’s 3/6/20 ruling granting Defendants Marna Lynn Fulcher, Jeffrey Lee Smith, and Patricia Ann Smith’s Motion to Set Aside Stipulation for Arbitration overruled (1) the U-Haul Defendants’ evidentiary objections to Mr. Sean P. Garretty’s declaration in support of the Fulcher Defendants’ Motion to Set Aside; and (2) the U-Haul Defendants’ objection and motion to strike the reply declarations of Mr. Sean P. Garretty, Ms. Reetha Haynes-Garretty, Marna Fulcher and Jeffrey Lee.

RULING:

In its 3/6/20 ruling granting Defendants Marna Lynn Fulcher, Jeffrey Lee Smith, and Patricia Ann Smith’s Motion to Set Aside Stipulation for Arbitration, the court did not rule on the U-Haul Defendants’ evidentiary objections to Mr. Sean P. Garretty’s declaration submitted in support of the motion or the U-Haul Defendants’ objection and motion to strike the reply declarations of Mr. Sean P. Garretty, Ms. Reetha Haynes-Garretty, Marna Fulcher and Jeffrey Lee.

In order to clarify the 3/6/20 ruling, the court now (1) overrules the U-Haul Defendants’ evidentiary objections to Mr. Sean P. Garretty’s declaration submitted in support of the Fulcher Defendants’ Motion to Set Aside and (2) overrules the U-Haul Defendants’ objection and denies the U-Haul Defendants’ motion to strike the reply declarations of Mr. Sean P. Garretty, Ms. Reetha Haynes-Garretty, Marna Fulcher and Jeffrey Lee.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UHAUL is a litigant

Latest cases where U-Haul Co of Colorado is a litigant

Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant