Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 18:57:23 (UTC).

FIDELITY & GUARANTY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS DORIS ANNA ENG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 FIDELITY GUARANTY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against DORIS ANNA ENG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4077

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIDELITY & GUARANTY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

ENG DORIS ANNA

VANESSA GAIL IVORY AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF STEVEN M. ENG AND DORIS A. ENG

THE ESTATE OF STEVEN M. ENG

ENG BRANDON

ENG MATTHEW

ENG JOEL

ENG NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YU ZINA

SHIN ANGELA Y

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

5/11/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 05/12/2021

5/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 05/12/2021

Case Management Statement

2/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/16/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT J...)

12/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT J...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/27/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/25/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/25/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/25/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

9/2/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

8/14/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/6/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/14/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

6/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/4/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • Hearing09/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Hearing09/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Hearing09/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 78; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of 05/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Zina Yu (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Change of Address); Filed by Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY & GUARANTY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YU ZINA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIN ANGELA