This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 08:04:52 (UTC).

FIDEL WINZEY JR VS VALOR CHRISTIAN ACADEMY

Case Summary

On 08/09/2017 FIDEL WINZEY JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VALOR CHRISTIAN ACADEMY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1515

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Defendant

ACADEMY VALOR CHRISTIAN

Guardian Ad Litem

WINZEY ROSALIND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DE LORIMIER PAUL A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/9/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

9/26/2017: SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

8/9/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT VALOR CHRISTIAN ACADEMY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/27/2017: DEFENDANT VALOR CHRISTIAN ACADEMY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order

5/16/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/16/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Stipulation and Order

3/25/2019: Stipulation and Order

Unknown

1/16/2019: Unknown

Stipulation and Order

1/7/2019: Stipulation and Order

Unknown

9/10/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/10/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by VALOR CHRISTIAN ACADEMY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Proposed Order and Stipulation to Continue Trial); Filed by FIDEL JR. WINZEY (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by VALOR CHRISTIAN ACADEMY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by ROSALIND WINZEY (Legacy Party); FIDEL JR. WINZEY (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1515    Hearing Date: October 29, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the Southwest District, Torrance, JUDGE R. SEE presiding in Department M for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE LORIMIER PAUL