This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2023 at 08:19:28 (UTC).

FIDEL PEREZ VS FAM, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 FIDEL PEREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FAM, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3308

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

PEREZ FIDEL

Defendant and Appellant

FAM LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KINGSLEY ERIC B.

SZAMET KELSEY MCCULLOUGH

Respondent Attorney

SCALI CHRISTIAN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B321157

8/31/2023: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B321157

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal

8/31/2023: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/11/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF CASE;)

4/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF CASE;)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/25/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT NOA 5/12/22 B321157

8/23/2022: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT NOA 5/12/22 B321157

Notice - DEFENDANT FAM, LLCS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE/DECLARATION OF CLAIRE MAYER IN RESPONSE TO DEFAULT DATED JULY 05, 2022

7/20/2022: Notice - DEFENDANT FAM, LLCS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE/DECLARATION OF CLAIRE MAYER IN RESPONSE TO DEFAULT DATED JULY 05, 2022

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

7/5/2022: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

6/2/2022: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)

5/26/2022: Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)

Order - COURT'S RULING AND ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

5/10/2022: Order - COURT'S RULING AND ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER HEARD ON MAY 4, 2022;)

5/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER HEARD ON MAY 4, 2022;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

5/10/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice - DEFENDANT FAM, LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEAL

5/12/2022: Notice - DEFENDANT FAM, LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION;)

5/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION;)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

5/4/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELSEY M. SZAMET IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

4/21/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELSEY M. SZAMET IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

4/21/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2023
  • Hearing10/13/2023 at 4:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B321157; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal: Status Date changed from 09/07/2023 to 08/31/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Case scheduled for 10/13/2023 at 04:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Case;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Motion for Class Certification scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 04:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Christian Joseph Scali (Attorney); Fam, LLC (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAddress for Christian Joseph Scali (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;) of 09/21/2021, Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAddress for Eric B. Kingsley (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Fidel Perez (Plaintiff); As to: Fam, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Fidel Perez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kenneth R. Freeman in Department 14 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less