This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2022 at 01:10:13 (UTC).

FIDEL GARCIA VASQUEZ VS ANTONIO RAMIREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 FIDEL GARCIA VASQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANTONIO RAMIREZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6698

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA VASQUEZ FIDEL

Defendants

METCALF INC RHINO EXTERIORS

RAMIREZ ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBSON ROBERT B.

Defendant Attorneys

PEARCE CHARLES WARDLAW

PERALTA REGINA Z.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/14/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/14/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/14/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/14/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

5/16/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/24/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Association of Attorney

7/10/2019: Association of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

8/7/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

10/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING OF HEARINGS DUE TO COVID-19;) OF 09/02/2020

9/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING OF HEARINGS DUE TO COVID-19;) OF 09/02/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING OF HEARINGS DUE TO COVID-19;)

9/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING OF HEARINGS DUE TO COVID-19;)

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

7/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/2/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

3/28/2022: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Fidel Garcia Vasquez (Plaintiff); METCALF, INC RHINO EXTERIORS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Regina Z. Peralta (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 09:41 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Rescheduling of Hearings due to Covid-19;) of 09/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Rescheduling of Hearings due to Covid-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY); Filed by Antonio Ramirez (Defendant); METCALF, INC RHINO EXTERIORS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by METCALF, INC RHINO EXTERIORS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Antonio Ramirez (Defendant); METCALF, INC RHINO EXTERIORS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Antonio Ramirez (Defendant); METCALF, INC RHINO EXTERIORS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fidel Garcia Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fidel Garcia Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fidel Garcia Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less