This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2023 at 05:08:09 (UTC).

FERREL, JESSICA ELIZABETH VS PEREZ, TERESA

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 FERREL, JESSICA ELIZABETH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PEREZ, TERESA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN, DURON, ARMANDO, DOTSON, KIMBERLY and POWELL, MICHAEL R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6061

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN

DURON, ARMANDO

DOTSON, KIMBERLY

POWELL, MICHAEL R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FERREL JESSICA ELIZABETH

Respondent

PEREZ TERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MOSQUEDA ROMAN P

 

Court Documents

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

7/29/2021: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

Judgment - -Stipulated

6/25/2021: Judgment - -Stipulated

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

6/25/2021: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

6/25/2021: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

Notice - Entry of Judgment - Marriage Termination Date: June 25, 2021

6/30/2021: Notice - Entry of Judgment - Marriage Termination Date: June 25, 2021

Notice - Limited Scope Representation

6/21/2021: Notice - Limited Scope Representation

Minute Order

6/25/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

5/27/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Declaration - Income and Expense

5/27/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

5/27/2021: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Proof of Service - Mail

5/27/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Witness List

5/27/2021: Witness List

Brief - ISC

5/27/2021: Brief - ISC

Proof of Service - Mail - re: ISC Brief, Exhibit List, Witness List

5/27/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - re: ISC Brief, Exhibit List, Witness List

Exhibit List

5/27/2021: Exhibit List

Proof of Service

3/30/2021: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

3/11/2021: Proof of Service

Order - Trial Setting Conference Orders: Notice of Settlement Conference

3/11/2021: Order - Trial Setting Conference Orders: Notice of Settlement Conference

137 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment (Marriage Termination Date: June 25, 2021 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department F, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Informal Settlement Conference - Held - Settled, Trial Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMSC - Settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketJudgment (-Stipulated )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less