This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2021 at 04:46:57 (UTC).

FERREL, JESSICA ELIZABETH VS PEREZ, TERESA

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 FERREL, JESSICA ELIZABETH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PEREZ, TERESA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DOTSON, KIMBERLY, POWELL, MICHAEL R. and DURON, ARMANDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6061

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DOTSON, KIMBERLY

POWELL, MICHAEL R.

DURON, ARMANDO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FERREL JESSICA ELIZABETH

Respondent

PEREZ TERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MOSQUEDA ROMAN P

Respondent Attorney

JANCU AMANDA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Separate Property

12/1/2020: Declaration - Separate Property

Minute Order

1/29/2021: Minute Order

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

6/11/2019: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

9/16/2019: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Memorandum - Points and Authorities

9/16/2019: Memorandum - Points and Authorities

Witness List

11/5/2019: Witness List

Exhibit List

11/14/2019: Exhibit List

Minute Order

2/28/2020: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • Hearing07/13/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 22 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Hearing06/25/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 18 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Video Authorized

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Hearing06/25/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 18 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 6, Duron, Armando, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Transfer - for all Purpose-Non Stip

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 22, Powell, Michael R., Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Limited Scope Representation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Child Custody and/or Visitation (Consolidate case; add last name to minor ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Related Case, 19STPT01577 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less