Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 09:59:59 (UTC).

FERNANDO SANTA CRUZ VS BOOST WORLDWIDE, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 FERNANDO SANTA CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BOOST WORLDWIDE, INC , A BUSINESS ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9355

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTA CRUZ FERNANDO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BOOST WORLDWIDE INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY

NEXTEL OF CALIFORNIA INC.

SPRINT CORPORATION

DISH WIRELESS L.L.C.

Cross Defendants

M.C. UNLIMITED WIRELESS

CASTILLO MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

TROCK ALAN L.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

12/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT AND MANUEL CSTILLO, MC UNLIMITED WIRELESS

11/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT AND MANUEL CSTILLO, MC UNLIMITED WIRELESS

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/17/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

9/17/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Answer

8/7/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

8/7/2020: Cross-Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/3/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/6/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/6/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/28/2020: PI General Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of filing of proof of service of summons and cross complaint and Manuel cstillo, MC unlimited wireless); Filed by Sprint Sollutions, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Boost Worldwide, Inc., a business entity (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Fernando Santa Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Raymond Ghermezian (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Sprint Sollutions, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Boost Worldwide, Inc., a business entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sprint Sollutions, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Boost Worldwide, Inc., a business entity (Defendant); Sprint Corporation (Defendant); Nextel of California, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Nextel of California, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Fernando Santa Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Fernando Santa Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Fernando Santa Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fernando Santa Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fernando Santa Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fernando Santa Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV19355    Hearing Date: December 02, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

FERNANDO SANTA CRUZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

BOOST WORLDWIDE, INC., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: 20STCV19355

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

December 2, 2020

 

Plaintiff’s attorney of record, Raymond Ghermezian, Esq (“Counsel”), seeks to be relieved as counsel, contending there has been a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. Counsel has filed proof of service on his client and on Defendants.

Counsel declares the moving papers were served on Client at a confirmed address. Counsel declares he confirmed the address through certified mail, return receipt. Certified mail does not establish proof the address is confirmed unless there is a signed return receipt. (See Cal. Rules of court, rule 3.1362(d)(2).) The Court will, therefore, require a copy of the signed return receipt at the time of the hearing. Counsel may submit a copy of the signed return receipt electronically prior to the hearing.

If Counsel appears and satisfies for the court that Plaintiff’s address is confirmed, the motion will be granted. Relief will be effective upon filing proof of service of the final order on Plaintiff. The court notes the next scheduled matter is a Final Status Conference set for 11/4/21, and trial is not scheduled until 11/18/21. Therefore, there will be no prejudice as a result of the granting of this motion.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 2nd day of December, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boost Worldwide Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where NEXTEL OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sprint Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TROCK ALAN L