*******8649
10/20/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Los Angeles, California
SERENA R. MURILLO
SANCHEZ FERNANDO
SANCHEZ HILDA
AMPAC LOGISTICS LLC
AMPAK LOGISTICS INC.
RUSH TRUCK LEASING INC.
3POWER LOGISTICS MANAGEMENT
AMPAK LOGISTICS INC.
RUSH TRUCK LEASING INC.
3POWER LOGISTICS MANAGEMENT
KHORSANDI ARASH
BURROWS WYETH
5/23/2023: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
5/17/2023: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
5/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT RUSH TRUCK LEASING, INC.S NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
5/17/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL J. NOLAN IN SUPPORT OF RUSH TRUCK LEASING, INCS APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
4/26/2023: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND 3POWER LOGISTICS MANAGEMENT
3/8/2023: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
3/6/2023: Proof of Service by Mail
3/6/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO
3/3/2023: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
3/2/2023: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
3/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
2/15/2023: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED PLAINTIFF FERNANDO SANCHEZ'S MOTION TO HA VE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE, AGAINST DEFENDANT AMP AK LOGISTICS, LLC; REQUEST FOR CO
2/15/2023: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT FURTHER DISCOVERY) - 1 MOVING PARTY, 1 MOTION PLAINTIFF FERNANDO SANCHEZ'S MOTION TO
2/15/2023: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
2/15/2023: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
2/10/2023: Request for Dismissal
2/10/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED, DUPLICATE
2/8/2023: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Hearing10/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal
[-] Read LessHearing03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial
[-] Read LessHearing02/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference
[-] Read LessHearing11/07/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")
[-] Read LessHearing11/07/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted
[-] Read LessHearing11/06/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")
[-] Read LessHearing11/06/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (Duplicate): Name Extension: (Duplicate) ; As To Parties changed from FERNANDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff) to FERNANDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: Status Date changed from 05/17/2023 to 05/23/2023 ; As To Parties: ; Status changed from Rejected to Filed
[-] Read LessDocketNotice DEFENDANT RUSH TRUCK LEASING, INC.S NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; Filed by: Rush Truck Leasing, Inc. (Defendant); As to: FERNANDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: FERNANDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: Rush Truck Leasing, Inc. (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: FERNANDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: Ampak Logistics Inc. (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: FERNANDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); HILDA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMPAC LOGISTICS LLC (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FERNANDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); HILDA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMPAC LOGISTICS LLC (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FERNANDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); HILDA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMPAC LOGISTICS LLC (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse
[-] Read LessCase Number: *******8649 Hearing Date: March 2, 2023 Dept: 29
TENTATIVE
Marc Mazorow of Law Offices of Marc A. Mazorow's (“Defendant’s Counsel”) Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel, requesting an Order permitting Defendant’s Counsel to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendant Ampac Logistics, LLC (“Defendant”) is GRANTED, effective upon the filing proof of service of this order with the court; Moving party to give notice.
Case Number: *******8649 Hearing Date: March 1, 2023 Dept: 29
Motion taken off calendar as moot.
Case Number: *******8649 Hearing Date: December 20, 2022 Dept: 29
Marc A. Mazorow moves to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Ampak. TENTATIVEThe motion is CONTINUED to allow counsel to include all hearing dates in the declaration and proposed order set in this matter.
Counsel submitted all the mandatory forms set forth in CRC rule 3.162. Counsel submitted the Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (MC-051) concurrently with the Declaration in Support (MC-052) on October 24, 2022 and submitted the Order Granting Attorney’s Motion (MC-053) on December 2, 2022. Also, counsel served the requisite forms on his client and on all parties that have appeared in this case on October 24,2022. (Proposed Order, Proof of Service 3, 5; Service List.) However, neither the declaration nor the proposed order includes all hearing dates set in this matter, including the Final Status Conference, trial, and OSC Re: Dismissal. (Declaration 5; Proposed Order 8.) The Final Status Conference, non-jury trial, and OSC RE: Dismissal are set for April 5, 2023, April 19, 2023, and October 16, 2024, respectively.
Conclusion
Marc A. Mazorow’s motion to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Ampak Logistics, LLC is CONTINUED to March 2, 2023 at 1:30 pm to allow counsel to include all hearing dates in the declaration and proposed order set in this matter. Moving party to give notice.
Case Number: *******8649 Hearing Date: November 17, 2022 Dept: 29
TENTATIVE
The motion to be relieved as counsel for Defendant, Ampac Logistics, is CONTINUED to allow counsel to file a proposed order and serve it on the client with the moving papers. There is currently no proposed order filed. Further, the declaration must be served on all parties who have appeared, and it must include all hearing dates set in this matter, including the Final Status Conference, trial, and OSC Re: Dismissal. The proposed order must also specify all hearings in this case.
Moving party is ordered to give notice. Matter continued to December 20, 2022 at 1:30 p.m.