This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 14:31:00 (UTC).

FERNANDO RAMIREZ VS CITY OF MONTEBELLO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 FERNANDO RAMIREZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CITY OF MONTEBELLO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LIA MARTIN and MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6668

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LIA MARTIN

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

RAMIREZ FERNANDO

Respondents and Defendants

BOBADILLA RENE

CITY OF MONTEBELLO

RAZO NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY PAUL M.

Defendant Attorney

DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION

 

Court Documents

Objection - OBJECTION TO THE COURT'S MINUTE ORDER OF MARCH 2, 2023

3/7/2023: Objection - OBJECTION TO THE COURT'S MINUTE ORDER OF MARCH 2, 2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND CLAR...)

3/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND CLAR...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JANET MURPHY, #9650 (VIDEO)

3/2/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JANET MURPHY, #9650 (VIDEO)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND CLAR...) OF 03/02/2023

3/2/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND CLAR...) OF 03/02/2023

Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

2/24/2023: Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND CLARIFICATION; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $2,500 AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF CO

2/17/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND CLARIFICATION; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $2,500 AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF CO

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY DOUMANIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND CLARIFICATION

2/17/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY DOUMANIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND CLARIFICATION

Order - AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

2/9/2023: Order - AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE AMENDED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL) OF 02/09/2023, AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

2/9/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE AMENDED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL) OF 02/09/2023, AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE AMENDED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL)

2/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE AMENDED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL)

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

2/3/2023: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

1/27/2023: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED NO PROOF OF SERVICE

1/20/2023: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED NO PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO RENE BOBADILLA AND NICHOLAS RAZO

1/5/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO RENE BOBADILLA AND NICHOLAS RAZO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER FOR DISMISSAL)

1/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER FOR DISMISSAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ORDER FOR DISMISSAL) OF 01/04/2023, ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

1/4/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ORDER FOR DISMISSAL) OF 01/04/2023, ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

Order - Dismissal

1/4/2023: Order - Dismissal

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketObjection to the Court's Minute Order of March 2, 2023; Filed by: Fernando Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Entire Action/Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Janet Murphy, #9650 (Video); Filed by: City of Montebello (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Reconsideration and Clar...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Reconsideration and Clar...) of 03/02/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification scheduled for 03/02/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Jury Trial scheduled for 09/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 09/07/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketReply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Fernando Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketOpposition TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND CLARIFICATION; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $2,500 AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF COUNSEL GIVEN FRIVOLOUS COURT FILING; Filed by: City of Montebello (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Fernando Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Fernando Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lia Martin in Department 16 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Fernando Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: City of Montebello (Defendant); Nicholas Razo (Defendant); Rene Bobadilla (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Fernando Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: City of Montebello (Defendant); Nicholas Razo (Defendant); Rene Bobadilla (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less