This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2023 at 17:24:36 (UTC).

FERNANDO DAVID RUVALCABA MURO VS PARTNERS PERSONNEL, A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 FERNANDO DAVID RUVALCABA MURO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PARTNERS PERSONNEL, A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3590

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUVALCABA MURO FERNANDO DAVID

Defendants

ALLIED EMPLOYEE SERVICES A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

ROSAS JOSE

PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PARTNERS PERSONNEL A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

NEUTRADERM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SERRANO OFELIA

NEXEM-ALLIED LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ESPERER HOLDINGS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PAINTER CHARLES STEPHEN

Other Attorneys

MANN MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/12/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

6/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/20/2021: Answer

Notice of Ruling

6/28/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

6/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

6/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/23/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/11/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Fernando David Ruvalcaba Muro on 01/29/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Fernando David Ruvalcaba Muro as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Fernando David Ruvalcaba Muro (Plaintiff); As to: Partners Personnel, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant); Partners Personnel Management Services, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Esperer Holdings Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 06/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20 updated: Result Date to 06/28/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Fernando David Ruvalcaba Muro (Plaintiff); As to: Ofelia Serrano (Defendant); Service Date: 06/20/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer: As To Parties changed from Fernando David Ruvalcaba Muro (Plaintiff) to Fernando David Ruvalcaba Muro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jose Rosas (Defendant); As to: Fernando David Ruvalcaba Muro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Fernando David Ruvalcaba Muro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Matthew Mann (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Mann Rogal to Mann Rogal APC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Fernando David Ruvalcaba Muro (Plaintiff); As to: Partners Personnel, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant); Partners Personnel Management Services, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Esperer Holdings Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Fernando David Ruvalcaba Muro (Plaintiff); As to: Partners Personnel, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant); Partners Personnel Management Services, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Esperer Holdings Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Fernando David Ruvalcaba Muro (Plaintiff); As to: Partners Personnel, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant); Partners Personnel Management Services, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Esperer Holdings Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kevin C. Brazile in Department 20 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less