This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2020 at 20:33:21 (UTC).

FERNANDEZ, LUIS ENRIQUE REYES VS ZAMORA, ADALBERTO

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 FERNANDEZ, LUIS ENRIQUE REYES filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against ZAMORA, ADALBERTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PALAZZOLO, ROBERT J. and NORD, SCOTT J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0328

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PALAZZOLO, ROBERT J.

NORD, SCOTT J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FERNANDEZ LUIS ENRIQUE REYES

Respondent

ZAMORA ADALBERTO

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

5/18/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

4/27/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

5/18/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

4/3/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - Civil Harassment

4/3/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted/Partly Denied

4/3/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted/Partly Denied

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/3/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

4/3/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Minute Order

4/27/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/27/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/27/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • Hearing06/08/2020 at 8:30 AM in Department A10 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Palazzolo, Robert J., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Palazzolo, Robert J., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Transfer - Different Department- This Hearing Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A12, Nord, Scott J., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Partly Granted/Partly Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.