This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2023 at 03:04:06 (UTC).

FERNANDA CHAVARINRICO VS HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 FERNANDA CHAVARINRICO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6753

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVARINRICO FERNANDA

Defendant

HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAFAIE MAJID

Defendant Attorney

MIGOYA KELLY W.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/17/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/17/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

8/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

9/26/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/26/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

11/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/23/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

11/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/02/2022

12/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/02/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

12/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2024
  • Hearing02/02/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/02/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 12/02/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAddress for Majid Safaie (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Fernanda Chavarinrico (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketAddress for Majid Safaie (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch in Department 39 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Fernanda Chavarinrico (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Fernanda Chavarinrico (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Fernanda Chavarinrico (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less