This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2022 at 07:46:56 (UTC).

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES, LLC VS BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 FERGUSON ENTERPRISES, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0293

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC

Defendants

2H CONSTRUCTION INC. A CORPORATION

BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SYKULSKI DANA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/18/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

5/31/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action); Filed by Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less