This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 09:29:23 (UTC).

FERESHTEH NASSEH VS. ROSS REGHABI, ESQ., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 FERESHTEH NASSEH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROSS REGHABI, ESQ . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN P. PFAHLER and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7770

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

NASSEH FERESHTEH

STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GHOVANLO AKBAR "ALEX"

GHOVANLO ASHKAN

THE GHOVANLO FAMILY TRUST

REGHABI ESQ. ROSS DBA SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LAW GROUP

GHOVANLO LADAN AMIN

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

INHOUSE CO. LAW FIRM

ZABEL LAW

TORABI KASRA SEYED

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID LIEBERTHAL ESQ.

ROSS K. REGHABI

REGHABI KHOSRO K.

 

Court Documents

Order - PROPOSED ORDER DIRECTING APPLICATION OF CASH DEPOSIT IN LIEU OF BOND OF UNDERTAKING

6/8/2021: Order - PROPOSED ORDER DIRECTING APPLICATION OF CASH DEPOSIT IN LIEU OF BOND OF UNDERTAKING

Other - - RETURNED MAIL - MINUTE ORDER FOR 10/23/2017

11/6/2017: Other - - RETURNED MAIL - MINUTE ORDER FOR 10/23/2017

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

12/26/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Other - - RETURNED MAIL - MINUTE ORDER FOR 12/27/2017

1/16/2018: Other - - RETURNED MAIL - MINUTE ORDER FOR 12/27/2017

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

6/27/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/16/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Brief - BRIEF BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS PERTAINING TO TERMINATING SANCTIONS

6/13/2019: Brief - BRIEF BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS PERTAINING TO TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - NOTICE OF REJECTION - PLEADINGS EX PARTE CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE PFAHLER FROM PLAINTIFF

6/18/2019: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - NOTICE OF REJECTION - PLEADINGS EX PARTE CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE PFAHLER FROM PLAINTIFF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

6/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT

7/31/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

7/31/2019: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/12/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER APPLYING DEPOSIT TO LIABILITY (CCP 995.760)

2/13/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER APPLYING DEPOSIT TO LIABILITY (CCP 995.760)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

2/13/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR MOTION FOR RELEASE OF BOND POSTED BY PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT NASSEH

3/2/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR MOTION FOR RELEASE OF BOND POSTED BY PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT NASSEH

Order - ORDER DIRECTING APPLICATION OF CASH DEPOSIT IN LIEU OF BOND OR UNDERTAKING TO LIABILITY

3/4/2020: Order - ORDER DIRECTING APPLICATION OF CASH DEPOSIT IN LIEU OF BOND OR UNDERTAKING TO LIABILITY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ...)

3/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ...)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/6/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProposed Order directing application of cash deposit in lieu of bond of undertaking; Filed by Ladan Amin Ghovanlo (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Applying Deposit to Liability (CCP 995.760)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Applying Deposit to Liability (CC...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Ladan Amin Ghovanlo (Cross-Complainant); AKBAR "ALEX" GHOVANLO (Defendant); ASHKAN GHOVANLO (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSupplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Apply Deposit to Liability (CCP 995.760); Filed by Ladan Amin Ghovanlo (Cross-Complainant); AKBAR "ALEX" GHOVANLO (Defendant); THE GHOVANLO FAMILY TRUST DATED (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Applying Deposit to Liability (CCP 995.760)) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Ladan Amin Ghovanlo (Cross-Complainant); AKBAR "ALEX" GHOVANLO (Defendant); ASHKAN GHOVANLO (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Applying Deposit to Liability (CC...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Applying Deposit to Liability (CCP 995.760)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
154 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by FERESHTEH NASSEH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by FERESHTEH NASSEH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by FERESHTEH NASSEH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by FERESHTEH NASSEH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketNotice re: Continuance of Hearing Conference- Case Management; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FERESHTEH NASSEH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7770    Hearing Date: August 11, 2020    Dept: F49

Dept. F-49

Calendar # 5

Date: 8-11-20 c/f 7-16-20 c/f 5-15-20

Case #****7770

APPLICATION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF DEPOSIT

MOVING PARTY: Defendants/Cross-Complainants, Akbar Ghovanlo, et al.

RESPONDING PARTY: Unopposed, Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant, Fereshteh Nasseh

RELIEF REQUESTED

Application for Disbursement of Cash Deposit

SUMMARY OF ACTION

In 2002, Plaintiff Nasseh came into contact with Defendant Akbar “Alex” Ghovanlo, an “experienced investment advisor who would help her with [Plaintiff] with her retirement planning, and handle her finances when she was deployed in the Navy overseas.” In 2007, on the advice of Ghovanlo, Plaintiff agreed to purchase a certain condominium unit in Calabasas for a price of $550,000. According to Plaintiff, the condominium unit was in fact owned by Govanlo, and therefore the purchase was part of a scheme to sell the property at an inflated value.

Plaintiff purchased the property with help in part through the execution of a $55,000 deed of trust executed to Ghovanlo.

A default was declared on January 23, 2017 and a foreclosure sale was set for May 26, 2017.

On May 23, 2017, Plaintiff filed a complaint for fraud, violation of Civil Code section 2923.57, cancellation of written instrument, breach of fiduciary duty, accounting, declaratory relief and injunctive relief. On November 17, 2017, the court granted the ex parte application enjoining the foreclosure sale. On November 27, 2017, Ghovanlo answered the complaint, and filed a verified cross-complaint for judicial foreclosure.

On December 27, 2017, the court granted the motion for preliminary injunction, and ordered Plaintiff to post a bond of $25,000. Plaintiff deposited $25,000 in cash with the court on March 8, 2018.

On March 1, 2018 Plaintiff dismissed T.D. Foreclosure Services, Inc.

On January 30, 2019 and March 15, 2019, the court granted the discovery motions of Defendants/Cross-Complainants Akbar Ghovanloo to compel responses to request for production of documents (set one), special interrogatories, and deem admissions admitted. On June 24, 2019, the Court granted the motion for terminating sanctions. The Court also granted terminating sanctions to Ross Reghabhi and The Ghonvalo Family Trust based on the failure to comply with prior discovery orders. The trial date was vacated and answer to the cross-complaint struck as well. The Court entered judgment in favor of Defendants on July 31, 2019, including damages and attorneys fees of $157,632.35 and $55,577.66.

RULING: Granted.

Defendants Akbar Ghovanloo, et al. move for the disbursement of the $25,000 cash deposit. Defendants seek the deposit pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 995.750. et seq. The sections provide in relevant part:

(a) The principal shall pay the amount of the liability on the deposit within 30 days after the date on which the judgment of liability becomes final.

Code Civ. Proc., ; 995.750

(a) If the principal does not pay the amount of the liability on the deposit within the time prescribed in Section 995.750, the deposit shall be collected, sold, or otherwise applied to the liability upon order of the court that entered the judgment of liability, made upon five days' notice to the parties.

(c) The deposit shall be distributed in the following order:

(1) First, to pay the cost of collection, sale, or other application of the deposit.

(2) Second, to pay the judgment of liability of the principal on the deposit.

(3) Third, the remainder, if any, shall be returned to the principal.

Code Civ. Proc., ; 995.760

A deposit given pursuant to this article shall be returned to the principal at the earliest of the following times:

(a) Upon substitution of a sufficient bond for the deposit. The bond shall be in full force and effect for all liabilities incurred, and for acts, omissions, or causes existing or which arose, during the period the deposit was in effect.

(b) The time provided by Section 995.360 for return of a bond.

(c) The time provided by statute for return of the deposit.

Code Civ. Proc., ; 995.770

The funds were deposited by Plaintiff as a condition of the preliminary injunction. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 529, subd. (a).) The purpose of the bond requirement is to protect a party against a protected interest of the enjoined party. (Hummell v. Republic Fed. Savings & Loan Assn. (1982) 133 Cal.App.3d 49, 51–52.) The admitted dissolving of the injunction and entry of judgment in favor of defendants removed any need for further protection of any enjoined interest.

At the July 16, 2020 hearing on the motion, the court ordered supplemental briefs on the issue of liability against Plaintiff for purposes of collecting on the cash deposited with the court. Defendants supplemental brief contends that the dismissal of the action and dissolution of the preliminary injunction establishes a basis of liability against the bond. (Wilshire Mortg. Corp. v. O.A. Graybeal Co. (1940) 41 Cal.App.2d 1, 6; Adams v. National Auto. Ins. Co. (1943) 56 Cal.App.2d 905, 910-911.)

The court agrees with moving defendants. The injunction enjoining the foreclosure sale was fundamental to the action. Defendants/Cross-Complainants sustained damages as a result of the injunction. The dismissal of the action, including the dissolution of the injunction, rendered the bond subject to liability.

The Court entered judgment in favor of Defendants on July 31, 2019, which included damages of $157,632.35. The amount awarded exceeds the amount of the deposit. Disbursement is ordered pursuant to the guidelines of Code of Civil Procedure section 995.760, subdivision (c)(1-2). The declaration of counsel states costs of $3,772.50 associated with collection, thereby leaving a balance of $21,227.50 for payment on the judgment. [Ruiz Decl.]

Moving parties to give notice.



Case Number: ****7770    Hearing Date: July 16, 2020    Dept: F49

Dept. F-49

Calendar # 5

Date: 7-16-20 c/f 5-15-20

Case #****7770

APPLICATION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF DEPOSIT

MOVING PARTY: Defendants/Cross-Complainants, Akbar Ghovanlo, et al.

RESPONDING PARTY: Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant, Fereshteh Nasseh

RELIEF REQUESTED

Application for Disbursement of Cash Deposit

SUMMARY OF ACTION

In 2002, Plaintiff Nasseh came into contact with Defendant Akbar “Alex” Ghovanlo, an “experienced investment advisor who would help her with [Plaintiff] with her retirement planning, and handle her finances when she was deployed in the Navy overseas.” In 2007, on the advice of Ghovanlo, Plaintiff agreed to purchase a certain condominium unit in Calabasas for a price of $550,000. According to Plaintiff, the condominium unit was in fact owned by Govanlo, and therefore the purchase was part of a scheme to sell the property at an inflated value.

Plaintiff purchased the property with help in part through the execution of a $55,000 deed of trust executed to Ghovanlo.

A default was declared on January 23, 2017 and a foreclosure sale was set for May 26, 2017.

On May 23, 2017, Plaintiff filed a complaint for fraud, violation of Civil Code section 2923.57, cancellation of written instrument, breach of fiduciary duty, accounting, declaratory relief and injunctive relief. On November 17, 2017, the court granted the ex parte application enjoining the foreclosure sale. On November 27, 2017, Ghovanlo answered the complaint, and filed a verified cross-complaint for judicial foreclosure.

On December 27, 2017, the court granted the motion for preliminary injunction, and ordered Plaintiff to post a bond of $25,000. Plaintiff deposited $25,000 in cash with the court on March 8, 2018.

On March 1, 2018 Plaintiff dismissed T.D. Foreclosure Services, Inc.

On January 30, 2019 and March 15, 2019, the court granted the discovery motions of Defendants/Cross-Complainants Akbar Ghovanloo to compel responses to request for production of documents (set one), special interrogatories, and deem admissions admitted. On June 24, 2019, the Court granted the motion for terminating sanctions. The Court also granted terminating sanctions to Ross Reghabhi and The Ghonvalo Family Trust based on the failure to comply with prior discovery orders. The trial date was vacated and answer to the cross-complaint struck as well. The Court entered judgment in favor of Defendants on July 31, 2019, including damages and attorneys fees of $157,632.35 and $55,577.66.

RULING: Denied

Defendants Akbar Ghovanloo, et al. move for the disbursement of the $25,000 cash deposit. Defendants seek the deposit pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 995.750. et seq. The sections provide in relevant part:

(a) The principal shall pay the amount of the liability on the deposit within 30 days after the date on which the judgment of liability becomes final.

Code Civ. Proc., ; 995.750

(a) If the principal does not pay the amount of the liability on the deposit within the time prescribed in Section 995.750, the deposit shall be collected, sold, or otherwise applied to the liability upon order of the court that entered the judgment of liability, made upon five days' notice to the parties.

(c) The deposit shall be distributed in the following order:

(1) First, to pay the cost of collection, sale, or other application of the deposit.

(2) Second, to pay the judgment of liability of the principal on the deposit.

(3) Third, the remainder, if any, shall be returned to the principal.

Code Civ. Proc., ; 995.760

A deposit given pursuant to this article shall be returned to the principal at the earliest of the following times:

(a) Upon substitution of a sufficient bond for the deposit. The bond shall be in full force and effect for all liabilities incurred, and for acts, omissions, or causes existing or which arose, during the period the deposit was in effect.

(b) The time provided by Section 995.360 for return of a bond.

(c) The time provided by statute for return of the deposit.

Code Civ. Proc., ; 995.770

The court only required the deposit of funds or a bond as a condition of the preliminary injunction. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 529, subd. (a).) The purpose of the bond requirement is to protect a party against a protected interest of the enjoined party. (Hummell v. Republic Fed. Savings & Loan Assn. (1982) 133 Cal.App.3d 49, 51–52.) The admitted dissolving of the injunction and entry of judgment in favor of defendants removed any need for further protection of any enjoined interest.

Even assuming the deposit were subject to collection by Defendants, nothing in the motion establishes the applicability of section 995.760. Defendants present no evidence of any responsibility by a principal for the payment of any liability, and a basis of entitlement for said funds, even if a principal owed funds.

Defendants therefore fail to establish any basis for the recovery of said deposit. The motion is denied.

Moving parties to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases where STEWART TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REGHABI ROSS K. ESQ.