This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 01:13:22 (UTC).

FENGJUN CHEN VS ALL ACCESS EXPRESS INC.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 a Labor - Other Labor case was filed by FENGJUN CHEN against ALL ACCESS EXPRESS INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0199

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHEN FENGJUN

GAO YONG

ZHU ZHIMING

Defendants

ALL ACCESS EXPRESS INC

XU JUAN

ALL ACCESS EXPRESS INC.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/11/2018: Complaint

Summons

4/11/2018: Summons

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/11/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/23/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration re: Due Diligence

6/11/2018: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Legacy Document

6/11/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

6/12/2018: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

9/25/2018: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/25/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for

1/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order

2/21/2019: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/22/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order

4/25/2019: Minute Order

Answer

5/23/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/25/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order

6/25/2019: Minute Order

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Default and Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by FENGJUN CHEN (Plaintiff); YONG GAO (Plaintiff); ZHIMING ZHU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Default and Default J...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Answer; Filed by ALL ACCESS EXPRESS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by FENGJUN CHEN (Plaintiff); YONG GAO (Plaintiff); ZHIMING ZHU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by FENGJUN CHEN (Plaintiff); YONG GAO (Plaintiff); ZHIMING ZHU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Default and Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Default and Default J...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by FENGJUN CHEN (Plaintiff); YONG GAO (Plaintiff); ZHIMING ZHU (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by FENGJUN CHEN (Plaintiff); YONG GAO (Plaintiff); ZHIMING ZHU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by FENGJUN CHEN (Plaintiff); YONG GAO (Plaintiff); ZHIMING ZHU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by FENGJUN CHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by FENGJUN CHEN (Plaintiff); YONG GAO (Plaintiff); ZHIMING ZHU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (and Addendum and Statement of Locatio); Filed by FENGJUN CHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: KC070199    Hearing Date: January 28, 2020    Dept: O

Plaintiffs Fengjun Chen, Yong Gao, Long He, ZhiMing Shu, YuTao Jiang and Weigong Shang’s motion for order to consolidate two related actions pursuant to CCP § 1048 is GRANTED.

Plaintiffs Fengjun Chen, Yong Gao, Long He, ZhiMing Shu, YuTao Jiang and Weigong Shang move to consolidate case number 19PSCV00584 with case number KC070199 pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 1048.

When actions involving a common question of law or fact are pending before the court, it may order a joint hearing or trial of any or all the matters in issue in the actions; it may order all the actions consolidated and it may make such orders concerning proceedings therein as may tend to avoid unnecessary costs or delay. (CCP § 1048.)

The Court finds that Case Nos. KC070199 and 19PSCV00584 involve a common question of law or fact. The actions involve the same parties and issues. Both actions assert the same seven (7) causes of action involving injury to six former employees of Defendant All Access Express, Inc. Because the actions will require overlapping discovery and witnesses, consolidation will promote judicial economy.

The Motion is GRANTED.