This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2022 at 12:19:23 (UTC).

FELIX FONTEBO, ET AL. VS AIRBNB INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 FELIX FONTEBO, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AIRBNB INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9077

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAKERE ATUH

YUNDZE WIRDZEDLI

DIONY TAKERE

FONTEBO SALLY

FONTEBO MBAH

TAKERE DERRICK

FONTEBO FELIX

TIKWE TAKERE

TAKERE FONGANG

ADANG COMFORT

FONTEBO ATUH

TAKERE EDITH

Defendants

AIRBNB PAYMENTS INC

YONGQIAN WU

AIRBNB INC.

YUYING SHEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NSAHLAI EMMANUEL KONGNYUY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/31/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/31/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/31/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/10/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE (CONDITIO...)]

10/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE (CONDITIO...)]

Request for Dismissal

9/29/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE (CONDITIO...)

7/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE (CONDITIO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE (CONDITIO...) OF 07/17/2020

7/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE (CONDITIO...) OF 07/17/2020

Notice of Settlement

7/15/2020: Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (Conditio...)]; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketAddress for Emmanuel Kongnyuy Nsahlai (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Conditional scheduled for 01/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by FELIX FONTEBO, et al. on 05/31/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ATUH FONTEBO, ATUH TAKERE, COMFORT ADANG, DERRICK TAKERE, EDITH TAKERE, FELIX FONTEBO, FONGANG TAKERE, MBAH FONTEBO, SALLY FONTEBO, TAKERE DIONY, TAKERE TIKWE, and WIRDZEDLI YUNDZE as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Conditional scheduled for 01/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (Conditio...) of 07/17/2020: Status Date changed from 07/17/2020 to 07/17/2020; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (Conditio...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (Conditio...) of 07/17/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/17/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 4B Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- AIRBNB INC., (Defendant): Organization Name changed from AIRBNB INC. to AIRBNB INC.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- AIRBNB PAYMENTS INC, (Defendant): Organization Name changed from AIRBNB PAYMENTS INC to AIRBNB PAYMENTS INC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FELIX FONTEBO (Plaintiff); SALLY FONTEBO (Plaintiff); ATUH FONTEBO (Plaintiff); MBAH FONTEBO (Plaintiff); TAKERE TIKWE (Plaintiff); TAKERE DIONY (Plaintiff); WIRDZEDLI YUNDZE (Plaintiff); ATUH TAKERE (Plaintiff); FONGANG TAKERE (Plaintiff); COMFORT ADANG (Plaintiff); EDITH TAKERE (Plaintiff); DERRICK TAKERE (Plaintiff); As to: AIRBNB INC. (Defendant); AIRBNB PAYMENTS INC (Defendant); WU YONGQIAN (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FELIX FONTEBO (Plaintiff); SALLY FONTEBO (Plaintiff); ATUH FONTEBO (Plaintiff); MBAH FONTEBO (Plaintiff); TAKERE TIKWE (Plaintiff); TAKERE DIONY (Plaintiff); WIRDZEDLI YUNDZE (Plaintiff); ATUH TAKERE (Plaintiff); FONGANG TAKERE (Plaintiff); COMFORT ADANG (Plaintiff); EDITH TAKERE (Plaintiff); DERRICK TAKERE (Plaintiff); As to: AIRBNB INC. (Defendant); AIRBNB PAYMENTS INC (Defendant); WU YONGQIAN (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Airbnb Payments, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AIRBNB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NSAHLAI EMMANUEL KONGNYUY