This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 10:08:24 (UTC).

FELIPE SOMANO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF SAN FERNANDO, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 FELIPE SOMANO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF SAN FERNANDO, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1670

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOMANO AN INDIVIDUAL FELIPE

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF SAN FERNANDO A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRADKIN IGOR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/10/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

6/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

6/18/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

6/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

6/29/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2024
  • Hearing06/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Hearing12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by FELIPE SOMANO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by FELIPE SOMANO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by FELIPE SOMANO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by FELIPE SOMANO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by FELIPE SOMANO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FELIPE SOMANO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FELIPE SOMANO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FELIPE SOMANO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SAN FERNANDO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRADKIN IGOR