This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2023 at 05:37:56 (UTC).

FELIPE A REYES VS JEREME ARMON WARE

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 FELIPE A REYES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEREME ARMON WARE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4817

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REYES FELIPE A.

Defendant

WARE JEREME ARMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERMAN MARTIN RAY

 

Court Documents

Judgment

12/6/2021: Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

12/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/2/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/2/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/2/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/2/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

11/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

10/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/18/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF FELIPE A. REYES RE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF FELIPE A. REYES RE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MARTIN R. BERMAN RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MARTIN R. BERMAN RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE/ FILE ...)

8/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE/ FILE ...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Publication

7/6/2021: Proof of Publication

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR JEREME

6/4/2021: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR JEREME

Application for Publication

5/27/2021: Application for Publication

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF EDGAR PACHECO IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

5/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF EDGAR PACHECO IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Reyes, Felipe A. against Defendant Ware, Jereme Armon on the Complaint filed by FELIPE A REYES on 09/05/2017 for damages of $30,325.00 and costs of $1,159.70 for a total of $31,484.70.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: Felipe A. Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Jereme Armon Ware (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter defaul...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter default judgment scheduled for 12/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 updated: Result Date to 12/06/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Felipe A. Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Jereme Armon Ware (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Felipe A. Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Felipe A. Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Felipe A. Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Jereme Armon Ware; On the Complaint filed by FELIPE A REYES on 09/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter default judgment scheduled for 12/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal scheduled for 09/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 02/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 5 - Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 02/19/19 at 10:00 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 03/05/19 at 8:30 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 09/08/20 at 8:30 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4817    Hearing Date: February 26, 2021    Dept: 32

At the hearing of January 15, 2021, Plaintiff’s counsel requested an opportunity to brief the issue whether the three-year service rule applies to this case, given that it was dismissed for some period of time. The Court granted the request and ordered that Plaintiff may file a brief addressing the issues raised in the tentative ruling on or before February 18, 2021. Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, the Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) scheduled for 01/15/2021 was continued to 02/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Department 32 at Spring Street Courthouse.

As of February 26, Plaintiff did not file a brief addressing the issues raised in the tentative ruling.  Therefore, the tentative ruling issued on January 15, 2021 is adopted as the order of the court.  The Clerk is to provide notice. 



Case Number: ****4817    Hearing Date: January 15, 2021    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

paolo pasio,

Plaintiff,

v.

denise duross,

Defendant.

Case No.: 19STCV02295

Hearing Date: January 15, 2021

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to compel deposition

Defendant Denise Duross (“Defendant”) moves to compel Plaintiff Paolo Pasio (“Plaintiff”) to appear for deposition. Per Code of Civil Procedure section 2025.450, if a party to the action fails to appear for deposition after service of a deposition notice and the party has not served a valid objection to that deposition notice, the party that noticed the deposition may move for an order to compel the deponent to attend and testify at deposition. (Code Civ. Proc., ;2025.450, subd. (a).) Defendant has the right to take Plaintiff’s deposition and is entitled to take Plaintiff’s deposition without leave of court at any time. (See Code Civ. Proc., ; 2025.210, subd. (a).) Plaintiff concedes that he must appear for deposition. Accordingly, the motion to compel deposition is granted.

The Court declines to award sanctions to either party. Both parties have failed cooperate sufficiently to schedule basic discovery. For this reason, the Court concludes that an award of sanctions to either side would be unjust. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2025.450, subd. (g)(1).)

Based upon the foregoing, the Court grants Defendant’s motion to compel Plaintiff’s deposition. The deposition shall occur within thirty (30) days of notice of this order unless the parties stipulate to a different date. The deposition may occur remotely unless all parties involved agree to an in-person deposition. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: January 15, 2021 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court