This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 00:23:31 (UTC).

FELIPA ALVARADO VS COMSTOCK CROSSER & ASSOCIATES DEVELOPMENT

Case Summary

On 11/06/2017 FELIPA ALVARADO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COMSTOCK CROSSER ASSOCIATES DEVELOPMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2493

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALVARADO FELIPA

Defendants and Respondents

COMSTOCK CROSSER & ASSOCIATES DEVELOP-

DOES 1 TO 50

RHA PARTNERS LTD.

SUPERIOR ASPHALT PAVING INC. ROE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALEH HUSSIN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MITTSKUS DANIELLE D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR 1. IMPLIED INDEMNITY; ETC

1/26/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR 1. IMPLIED INDEMNITY; ETC

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/26/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

1/26/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/16/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/6/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

11/6/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Comstock, Crosser & Associates Develop- (Defendant); RHA Partners, Ltd. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial, FSC and Related Motion Discovery Dates); Filed by RHA Partners, Ltd. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Answer; Filed by RHA Partners, Ltd. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Comstock, Crosser & Associates Develop- (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Felipa Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Comstock, Crosser & Associates Develop- (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2018
  • Summons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Comstock, Crosser & Associates Develop- (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Comstock, Crosser & Associates Develop- (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Comstock, Crosser & Associates Develop- (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR 1. IMPLIED INDEMNITY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Felipa Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RHA Partners, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMSTOCK CROSSNER & ASSOCIATES DEVELOPMEN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITTSKUS DANIELLE