This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:33:44 (UTC).

FELIMON LEPE VS CASE DE CARROS

Case Summary

On 02/16/2017 FELIMON LEPE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CASE DE CARROS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PETER A. HERNANDEZ and DUKES, ROBERT A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9071

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

DUKES, ROBERT A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEPE FELIMON

Defendants

CASE DE CARROS

QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC.

MARCHOUD AHMAD

GUTIERREZ STEVE

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE CO.

CASA DE CARROS

FAZILI FARZAD

AMERICAN ROAD LEASING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LUCENTE MARCELLA LAW OFFICES OF

LUCENTE MARCELLA

Defendant Attorneys

FALLAT JOHN LYSTER

ELDER WILLIAM NORMAN JR

GELLER MICHAEL S. ESQ

FALLAT JOHN L. LAW OFFICE OF

GELLER MICHAEL STEVEN ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

3/17/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

6/7/2017: Case Management Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

6/12/2017: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Unknown

6/12/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

7/18/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

9/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/7/2017: Unknown

Unknown

5/16/2018: Unknown

Unknown

5/25/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

7/26/2018: Minute Order

Order

7/26/2018: Order

Unknown

8/2/2018: Unknown

Other -

10/16/2018: Other -

Motion for Order

3/25/2019: Motion for Order

Opposition

4/18/2019: Opposition

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/16/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/22/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Order (Ruling on the Court's Tentative Ruling); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Michael Steven Geller, ESQ (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (MOTION TO HAVE REQUESTED ADMISSIONS BE DEEMED ADMITTED AGAINST FELIMON LEPE) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Amended; Filed by American Road Leasing, Inc. (Defendant); Farzad Fazili (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Errata); Filed by American Road Leasing, Inc. (Defendant); Farzad Fazili (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by American Road Leasing, Inc. (Defendant); Farzad Fazili (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
175 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by CASA DE CARROS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FELIMON LEPE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by FELIMON LEPE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Summons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: KC069071    Hearing Date: January 22, 2020    Dept: O

Plaintiffs’ application for default judgment is DENIED without prejudice for the following reasons:

  1. Relief sought is not within amount of prayer of complaint or statement of damages. (Due Process; Greenup v. Rodman (1986) 42 Cal.3d 822, 824.). [EXHIBIT 1 OF VEHICLE PURCHASE AGREEMENT NOT INCLUDED IN DEFAULT PACKET]

  2. Attorney Fees requested amount not in compliance with Local R. 3.214.

  3. No proposed form of judgment. (CRC 3.1800 (a)(6); see Form JUD-100.)