This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 08:49:14 (UTC).

FELICITAS ESCALANTE ET AL VS QINGGAO DENG

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 FELICITAS ESCALANTE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against QINGGAO DENG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, MARK A. BORENSTEIN, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3919

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

PITA RAQUEL

ESCALANTE FELICITAS

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

DENG QINGGAO

Minor

PITA VICTORIA

Guardian Ad Litem and Not Classified By Court

PITA LOURDES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RICHARDSON GAIL W.

RICHARDSON GAIL WALTHER ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

PUCKETT KIM B. ESQ.

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

RICHARDSON GAIL WALTHER ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE MAY 24, 2021 HEARING TO M...)

5/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE MAY 24, 2021 HEARING TO M...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITIONER/GUARDIAN AD LITEM, LOURDES PITA'S PETIT...)

5/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITIONER/GUARDIAN AD LITEM, LOURDES PITA'S PETIT...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE MARCH 30, 2021 HEARING TO ...) OF 03/24/2021

3/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE MARCH 30, 2021 HEARING TO ...) OF 03/24/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE MARCH 30, 2021 HEARING TO ...)

3/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE MARCH 30, 2021 HEARING TO ...)

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

3/5/2021: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Notice of Settlement

1/9/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)]

1/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 01/09/2020

1/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 01/09/2020

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/14/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

4/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE - NOT ENTERED - MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE IS REQUIRED - MINOR LOURDES PITA IS 7 YEARS OLD))

10/15/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE - NOT ENTERED - MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE IS REQUIRED - MINOR LOURDES PITA IS 7 YEARS OLD))

Notice of Ruling

10/22/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (MINOR) - UNCO...)

2/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (MINOR) - UNCO...)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

9/28/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/31/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

SUMMONS -

4/30/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2/9/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((MINOR) - Unconditional Notice Filed 01/09/2020) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Felicitas Escalante (Plaintiff); Raquel Pita (Plaintiff); Victoria Pita, by and through Her Guardian Ad Litem, Lourdes Pita (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise (- Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, Lourdes Pita's Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action as to Minor Claimant Victoria Pita (Age 7)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, Lourdes Pita's Petit...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) ((as to Minor Claimant: Victoria Pita (Age 7))); Filed by Lourdes Pita (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise (- Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, Lourdes Pita's Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action as to Minor Claimant Victoria Pita (Age 7)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 3:53 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of the May 24, 2021 Hearing to M...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise (- Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, Lourdes Pita's Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action as to Minor Claimant Victoria Pita (Age 7)) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, Lourdes Pita's Petit...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Qinggao Deng (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Felicitas Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Felicitas Escalante (Plaintiff); Raquel Pita (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693919    Hearing Date: May 24, 2021    Dept: 29

Escalante, et. al.    vs.   Deng

Court order Re:  Continuance of Hearing on Minor's Compromise Petition from 05/24/2021 to May 26, 2021 

On the Court's own motion, hearing on Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim as to Minor Claimant Victoria Pita (Age 7) is continue to May 26, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC693919    Hearing Date: April 28, 2021    Dept: 29

I. TENTATIVE

I. PtPetition by Amber Hagan to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Claimant Minor Victoria Pita file a Proposed Order on Form MC-351, and failed to give notice to the other parties.

Moving party to given notice. 

Case Number: BC693919    Hearing Date: March 30, 2021    Dept: 29

Escalante, et. al.  vs.  Deng

Court Order Re: Continuance of the March 30, 2021 Hearing to April 28, 2021;

On the Court's own motion, the Hearing on Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, Lourdes Pita's Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action as to Minor Claimant: Victoria Pita (Age 7) scheduled for 03/30/2021 is continued to 04/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at Spring Street Courthouse.

Counsel for the Moving Party(ies) is ordered to give notice and file proof of service of said notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PUCKETT KIM B. ESQ.