Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 04:57:51 (UTC).

FELICITA MORALES-LUJAN VS LORENZO JUAREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 FELICITA MORALES-LUJAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LORENZO JUAREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7829

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MORALES-LUJAN FELICITA

Defendants and Respondents

RASIER LLC

EVS INCORPORATION

ALL CITY TOWING

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 50

STEINACKER GREGG - DOE 1

JUAREZ LORENZO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

JUAREZ LORENZO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DAYBALL JOSEPH C.

Defendant Attorneys

DIXON MICHELLE Y. ESQ.

GOLUB BETH ISAACS

ANGELOPOULOS TRACEY L. DEPUTY ATTORNEY

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT RASIER, LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

5/25/2018: DEFENDANT RASIER, LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

5/25/2018: DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS LORENZO JUAREZ AND E.V.S., INC. D.B.A. ALL CITY TOWING'S ANSWER; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/27/2018: DEFENDANTS LORENZO JUAREZ AND E.V.S., INC. D.B.A. ALL CITY TOWING'S ANSWER; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CROSS-CROSSPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNIFICATION AND CONTRIBUTION, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

6/27/2018: CROSS-CROSSPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNIFICATION AND CONTRIBUTION, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

SUMMONS

6/27/2018: SUMMONS

Unknown

6/27/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/24/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/29/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Answer

10/3/2018: Answer

GREGG JOSEPH STEINACKER'S ANSWER TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT ON RECORD

10/3/2018: GREGG JOSEPH STEINACKER'S ANSWER TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT ON RECORD

Notice

12/6/2018: Notice

SUMMONS

12/20/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/20/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Rasier LLc (Defendant); Uber Technologies incorporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Notice (Notice of Unavailability of Counsel); Filed by Felicita Morales-Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Stipulation and Order (protective order); Filed by Rasier LLc (Defendant); Uber Technologies incorporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Felicita Morales-Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • GREGG JOSEPH STEINACKER'S ANSWER TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT ON RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Answer; Filed by STEINACKER, GREGG - (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Felicita Morales-Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by LORENZO JUAREZ (Legacy Party); All City Towing (Defendant); EVS incorporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2018
  • Response; Filed by Rasier LLc (Defendant); Uber Technologies incorporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DEFENDANT RASIER, LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Response; Filed by Rasier LLc (Defendant); Uber Technologies incorporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Felicita Morales-Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Felicita Morales-Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Felicita Morales-Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL CITY TOWING is a litigant

Latest cases where E.V.S. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant