This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 08:01:43 (UTC).

FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. VS VINCENT HUANG & ASSOCIATES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VINCENT HUANG ASSOCIATES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0242

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES INC.

Defendant

VINCENT HUANG & ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUI LONG

Defendant Attorney

HILTON LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/19/2019: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

7/19/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/19/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

8/5/2019: Minute Order

Answer

4/9/2019: Answer

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/13/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/13/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

3/12/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/12/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Vincent Huang & Associates, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Vincent Huang & Associates, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VINCENT HUANG AND ASSOCIATES L is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES INC. AKA FED EX is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUI LONG