This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2023 at 18:57:12 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION VS JUDY T. SHUI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JUDY T SHUI,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0006

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Defendants

BAKER JAMES SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN A. BAKER AND TERESA R. BAKER IRREVOCABLE TRUST

COUNTRYWOOD PARK HOMES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

SHUI JUDY T. FKA JUDY T. LUI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEWIN JAMES F

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/3/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/3/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/3/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/3/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/3/2023: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/27/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • Hearing05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department L at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • Hearing05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department L at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTRYWOOD PARK HOMES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/18/2023; Service Cost: 64.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: Judy T. Shui (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/19/2023; Service Cost: 64.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: Judy T. Shui (Defendant); James Baker, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN A. BAKER AND TERESA R. BAKER, IRREVOCABLE TRUST, DATED 09/02/97 (Defendant); COUNTRYWOOD PARK HOMES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: Judy T. Shui (Defendant); James Baker, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN A. BAKER AND TERESA R. BAKER, IRREVOCABLE TRUST, DATED 09/02/97 (Defendant); COUNTRYWOOD PARK HOMES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: Judy T. Shui (Defendant); James Baker, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN A. BAKER AND TERESA R. BAKER, IRREVOCABLE TRUST, DATED 09/02/97 (Defendant); COUNTRYWOOD PARK HOMES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department L Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less