This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2022 at 08:19:18 (UTC).

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS MEGA INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEGA INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1625

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

MEGA INTERNATIONAL LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO JR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/19/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Federal Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Mega International, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/12/2022; Service Cost: 109.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Helen Zukin in Department 207 Beverly Hills Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Federal Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Mega International, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Federal Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Mega International, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Federal Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Mega International, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEGA INTERNATIONAL AND CONSTRUCTION CORP., a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO