This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 13:18:26 (UTC).

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS DESMOND K. WOOLFOLK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DESMOND K WOOLFOLK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5539

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ABBAS DAMANI

ALIZAARA LLC

WOOLFOLK DESMOND K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEYER DARRIN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/8/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/8/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/8/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/8/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/8/2022: Complaint

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/18/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2024
  • Hearing08/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2024
  • Hearing02/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2024
  • Hearing01/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Federal Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Federal Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Federal Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Federal Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Federal Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYER DARRIN