Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2021 at 11:02:41 (UTC).

FEATURED ARTISTS AGENCY VS CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 FEATURED ARTISTS AGENCY filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8555

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEATURED ARTISTS AGENCY

Defendant

CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MERRITT RANDY

MERRITT RANDY R. ESQ.

GOLDEN JAMES M.

Defendant Attorneys

ROSENBERG JOSHUA M.

FITZGERALD CHAD R.

KINSELLA DALE F.

 

Court Documents

Status Report - STATUS REPORT JOINT

10/26/2020: Status Report - STATUS REPORT JOINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

10/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Change of Firm Name

10/15/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND) (3RD)

6/24/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND) (3RD)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/16/2020

6/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/16/2020

Notice of Related Case

5/29/2020: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/21/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Related Case

11/22/2019: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/19/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE / TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE / TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/15/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

1/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Related Case

1/29/2020: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 02/10/2020

2/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 02/10/2020

Case Management Statement

2/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/28/2019: Complaint

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Featured Artists Agency (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Status Conference (/ Trial Setting Conference) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference / Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Featured Artists Agency (Plaintiff); Creative Artists Agency, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Featured Artists Agency (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Jury Trial ( (5 day estimate)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketStatus Report (Joint); Filed by Featured Artists Agency (Plaintiff); Creative Artists Agency, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (- *Dept 34 has older case*); Filed by Featured Artists Agency (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Creative Artists Agency, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Featured Artists Agency (Plaintiff); Creative Artists Agency, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (- *Dept 34 has older case*); Filed by Featured Artists Agency (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Featured Artists Agency (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Featured Artists Agency (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Featured Artists Agency (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MERRITT RANDY R.