This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 05:54:25 (UTC).

FC MARKETPLACE, LLC VS GRAND OCEAN TRADING COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 FC MARKETPLACE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GRAND OCEAN TRADING COMPANY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0876

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FC MARKETPLACE LLC

Defendant

GRAND OCEAN TRADING COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHOW RONNIE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/1/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/1/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • Hearing02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by FC MARKETPLACE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FC MARKETPLACE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FC MARKETPLACE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FC MARKETPLACE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FC MARKETPLACE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW, RONNIE