This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2021 at 22:06:43 (UTC).

FATIMA G. SANCHEZ VS T4S MANAGEMENT CA LLC

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 FATIMA G SANCHEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against T4S MANAGEMENT CA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2517

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ FATIMA G.

Defendants

T4S MANAGEMENT CA LLC

WANI DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KURATA MELISSA MISAO

NOURMAND MICHAEL

EMRANI MICHELLE M.

Defendant Attorney

BENAKOTE AMIR DAVID

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

9/24/2021: Notice of Ruling

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MEDIATE PLAINTIFF'S INDIVIDUAL AND PAGA REPRESENTATIVE ACTION AND CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/13/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MEDIATE PLAINTIFF'S INDIVIDUAL AND PAGA REPRESENTATIVE ACTION AND CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/11/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

3/11/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

12/28/2020: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

12/15/2020: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

Notice of Related Case

12/22/2020: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

12/9/2020: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

9/11/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

9/11/2020: Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Continuance

9/15/2020: Notice of Continuance

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • Hearing02/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by T4S Management CA LLC (Defendant); David Wani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Mediate Plaintiff's Individual and Paga Representative Action and Continue Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Fatima G. Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement; Filed by Fatima G. Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Fatima G. Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order); Filed by Fatima G. Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Fatima G. Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docketat 09:41 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case) of 06/30/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fatima G. Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fatima G. Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T4S MANAGEMENT CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENAKOTE AMIR DAVID