This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 16:04:59 (UTC).

FASICA SHIFERAW VS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 FASICA SHIFERAW filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1796

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIFERAW FASICA

Defendant

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECKER TODD BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/22/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/27/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2024
  • Hearing08/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Hearing02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • Hearing02/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fasica Shiferaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fasica Shiferaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fasica Shiferaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKER TODD BENJAMIN