This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2023 at 00:22:42 (UTC).

FASHION NOVA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, VS CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 FASHION NOVA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1107

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FASHION NOVA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FKA FASHION NOVA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA A CORPORATION

THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

O'HANLON MATTHEW

SCHACK DAVID P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/18/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/18/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/18/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/18/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/18/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/19/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

2/22/2023: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/27/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/10/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Continuance

5/17/2023: Notice of Continuance

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: FASHION NOVA, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 06/20/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 05/26/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FASHION NOVA, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, (Plaintiff); As to: CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a corporation (Defendant); THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FASHION NOVA, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, (Plaintiff); As to: CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a corporation (Defendant); THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FASHION NOVA, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, (Plaintiff); As to: CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a corporation (Defendant); THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 51 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less