Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 16:23:00 (UTC).

FARZIN MALY, ET AL. VS BRETT C HARRISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 FARZIN MALY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BRETT C HARRISON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are VIRGINIA KEENY, PAUL A. BACIGALUPO and VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1817

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

VIRGINIA KEENY

PAUL A. BACIGALUPO

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOGHADDAM BAHAREH MOHAMMADZADEH

MALY FARZIN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PROMINENCE CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LLOYD DAVID THOMAS

RE/MAX OLSON & ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CENTER STREET LENDING FUND IV SPE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BCH ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HARRISON BRETT C AKA BRETT CHRISTIAN HARRISON

CT LIEN SOLUTIONS AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN TYPE

SIMONE MARIO

OCKWELL CHARLES

THE TUROCI FIRM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BAGNARD COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HARRISON TRYSTON

BM STEWARDSHIP INV. LLC A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HARRISON BRETT C

XQB MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

XQB MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA RE/MAX OLSON & ASSOCIATES

TWISTED RIVER CAPITAL LLC

XQB MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BCH ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HARRISON BRETT C

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPITZER DANIEL BRUCE

GAUMER CHRISTIE

Defendant Attorneys

KALE MICHAEL ALAN

GORDON ALLISON C.

ROTH THOMAS MICHAEL

HOEFFLIN RICHARD MICHAEL

WITCHER RACHEL CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

Brief - BRIEF MSC STATEMENT OF BRETT C. HARRISON, BCH ENTERPRISES, LLC AND TWISTED RIVER CAPITAL, LLC

5/18/2021: Brief - BRIEF MSC STATEMENT OF BRETT C. HARRISON, BCH ENTERPRISES, LLC AND TWISTED RIVER CAPITAL, LLC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Brief - BRIEF MSC STATEMENT OF XQB MANAGEMENT, INC., DAVID LLOYD AND TRISTAN HARRISON

5/6/2021: Brief - BRIEF MSC STATEMENT OF XQB MANAGEMENT, INC., DAVID LLOYD AND TRISTAN HARRISON

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/29/2021

4/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/29/2021

Cross-Complaint

4/30/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/30/2021: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/19/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/19/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Case Management Statement

2/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

12/15/2020: Answer

Answer

12/15/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/30/2020

10/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: HEARING TIME CHANGE AND TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES)

6/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: HEARING TIME CHANGE AND TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: HEARING TIME CHANGE AND TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES) OF 06/04/2020

6/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: HEARING TIME CHANGE AND TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES) OF 06/04/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • Hearing07/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Hearing06/18/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department C at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department C, Valerie Salkin, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Center Street Lending Fund IV SPE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketBrief (MSC Statement of Brett C. Harrison, BCH Enterprises, LLC and Twisted River Capital, LLC); Filed by Twisted River Capital, LLC (Defendant); Brett C Harrison (Defendant); BCH Enterprises, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketBrief (MSC Statement of XQB Management, Inc., David Lloyd and Tristan Harrison); Filed by Tryston Harrison (Defendant); David Thomas Lloyd (Defendant); XQB MANAGEMENT, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Farzin Maly (Plaintiff); Bahareh Mohammadzadeh Moghaddam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by Farzin Maly (Plaintiff); Farzin Maly (Plaintiff); Bahareh Mohammadzadeh Moghaddam (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Farzin Maly (Plaintiff); Bahareh Mohammadzadeh Moghaddam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Farzin Maly (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Farzin Maly (Plaintiff); Bahareh Mohammadzadeh Moghaddam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TUROCI FIRM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BAGNARD COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RE/MAX OLSON & ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BCH ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant