This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 03:41:16 (UTC).

FARZAN ALAMIRAD VS TILA NOOR

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 FARZAN ALAMIRAD filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against TILA NOOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1979

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ALAMIRAD FARZAN

FARZAN ALAMIRAD D.D.S. INC. DBA GENTLE BIODENTISTRY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

NOOR TILA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'ATTARAY MAINAK

Defendant Attorney

MESRIANI RODNEY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/8/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/8/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/8/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/8/2022: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO SEAL THE COURT RECORDS [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

7/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO SEAL THE COURT RECORDS [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO SEAL THE ...)

7/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO SEAL THE ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO SEAL THE ...) OF 07/18/2022

7/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO SEAL THE ...) OF 07/18/2022

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

5/27/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/27/2022: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Docketat 4:45 PM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation of the parties to seal the ...) of 07/18/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation of the parties to seal the ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketJoint Stipulation of the parties to seal the court records [Proposed] order thereon; Filed by Farzan Alamirad (Plaintiff); Tila Nourouzadeh Erroneously Sued As Tila Noor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tila Nourouzadeh Erroneously Sued As Tila Noor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Tila Nourouzadeh Erroneously Sued As Tila Noor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Tila Nourouzadeh Erroneously Sued As Tila Noor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Farzan Alamirad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Farzan Alamirad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Farzan Alamirad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less