This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 22:29:54 (UTC).

FARZAD SOHRABKHANI, ET AL. VS 4A CRANE SERVICE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 FARZAD SOHRABKHANI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against 4A CRANE SERVICE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2653

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AZIZIYAN ELHAM

SOHRABKHANI FARZAD

Defendants

SOLORIO FERNANDO GALVAN

4A CRANE SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESRIANI RODNEY

Defendant Attorney

BREMER KEITH G

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

4/13/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

4/28/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Hearing09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by 4A Crane Service, Inc. (Defendant); Fernando Galvan Solorio (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 4A Crane Service, Inc. (Defendant); Fernando Galvan Solorio (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Farzad Sohrabkhani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Farzad Sohrabkhani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Farzad Sohrabkhani (Plaintiff); Elham Aziziyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Farzad Sohrabkhani (Plaintiff); Elham Aziziyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Farzad Sohrabkhani (Plaintiff); Elham Aziziyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESRIANI RODNEY