This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/10/2022 at 00:18:04 (UTC).

FARRAH MATOVU VS MACY'S, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 FARRAH MATOVU filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against MACY'S, INC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5566

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATOVU FARRAH

Defendants

MACY'S INC

MACY'S WEST LLC

MACY'S WEST STORES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGGE EMMANUEL OHIKHUARE

Defendant Attorney

LENKOV JEFFREY M

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/8/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/8/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/8/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/8/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

8/8/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/13/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/13/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/22/2022: Notice - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

11/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Request for Dismissal

12/5/2022: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by FARRAH MATOVU on 08/08/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by FARRAH MATOVU as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: FARRAH MATOVU (Plaintiff); As to: Macy's, Inc (Defendant); Macy's West Stores, Inc (Defendant); Macy's West, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability of Counsel; Filed by: FARRAH MATOVU (Plaintiff); As to: Macy's, Inc (Defendant); Macy's West Stores, Inc (Defendant); Macy's West, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; Filed by: Macy's, Inc (Defendant); Macy's West Stores, Inc (Defendant); Macy's West, LLC (Defendant); As to: FARRAH MATOVU (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Macy's West Stores, Inc (Defendant); As to: FARRAH MATOVU (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Macy's West Stores, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: FARRAH MATOVU (Plaintiff); As to: Macy's, Inc (Defendant); Service Date: 08/11/2022; Service Cost: 87.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FARRAH MATOVU (Plaintiff); As to: Macy's, Inc (Defendant); Macy's West Stores, Inc (Defendant); Macy's West, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FARRAH MATOVU (Plaintiff); As to: Macy's, Inc (Defendant); Macy's West Stores, Inc (Defendant); Macy's West, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MACY'S DEPARTMENT STORES is a litigant

Latest cases where MACY'S is a litigant

Latest cases where MACY'S WEST STORES INC. AN OHIO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGGE EMMANUEL O.