Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 15:04:08 (UTC).

FARNAZ FARSI VS GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY

Case Summary

On February 10, 2021, Farnaz Farzi (hereinafter, "Plaintiff'), represented by Levy Lawrence, filed a personal injury lawsuit against General Motors Company and DOES 1 through 100, inclusive (the Defendant”) seeking damages in excess of $ 25,000, amongst other reliefs for suffering severe and permanent injuries as a result of subjected accident resulting from lost control of subjected vehicle. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Court in the Spring Street Courthouse. 

 

In their complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “at all times mentioned herein Defendant, and DOES I through 100, inclusive, and each of them, were and are engaged in the business of manufacturing, fabricating, designing, assembling, distributing, buying, selling, inspecting, servicing, repairing, marketing, warranting, modifying, leasing and advertising a certain 2016 GMC Yukon, bearing vehicle identification number ("VIN") GKS IBKCXGR349217 (hereinafter "SUBJECT VEHICLE") and each and every component part thereof, for use in interstate commerce and in the State of California.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “on or about February 12, 2019 at approximately 9:00 a.m., Plaintiff was lawfully operating the SUBJECT VEHICLE… on San Gabriel Canyon Road. At that time, the steering wheel in the SUBJECT VEHICLE began shaking so vigorously, that Plaintifflost control of the SUBJECT VEHICLE. The SUBJECT VEHICLE crashed through multiple barriers, veering onto the opposite side of San Gabriel Canyon Road, before finally crashing into a barrier or rock formation and coming to a rest. Plaintiff Suffered severe and permanent injuries as a result of the subject accident.”

 

The Plaintiff laid down two causes of action. Under the first cause of action for strict product liability, the Plaintiff alleged that the Subject Vehicle contained design and/or manufacturing defects, and which was capable of causing and in fact did cause personal injuries to the user and consumer thereof, while being used in a manner reasonably foreseeable, thereby rendering same unsafe and dangerous for use by the consumer, user and/or bystander and that“as a direct and proximate result of the conduct of Defendant and DOES I through 100, inclusive, and each of them, and the defects in the SUBJECT VEHICLE, Plaintiff was injured and hurt in her health, strength and activity, sustaining injuries to her body, and shock and injury to her nervous system and person, all of which said injuries have caused and continue to cause Plaintiff great physical, mental and nervous pain and suffering, disfigurement and physical disability. Plaintiff suffered severe injuries. Plaintiff is further informed and believes, and thereupon alleges, that said injuries will result in permanent disability, all to her general damage in an amount that will be stated according to proof, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 425.10.” The second claim laid down by the Plaintiff is for negligent product liability arising from the alleged actions of the Defendants.

 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs requested the court to pass an order for general damages in excess of twenty-five thousand dollars ($25,000.00), according to proof, hospital, medical, medical monitoring, professional and incidental expenses, according to proof, loss of earnings and loss of earning capacity, according to proof with prejudgment interest and costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5458

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARSI FARNAZ

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEVY LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/4/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/10/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2024
  • Hearing02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • Hearing08/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Hearing07/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Farnaz Farsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Farnaz Farsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Farnaz Farsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY LAWRENCE