This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 02:19:31 (UTC).

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE VS DANIEL DE SLOOVER

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against DANIEL DE SLOOVER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2142

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

DE SLOOVER DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

WELLS VANESSA OTTILIE

TETI JORDAN DANIEL

SEQUOIA MELODY L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/30/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 09/22/2021

9/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 09/22/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 09/30/2021, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE NOTICE - FIRST AM

9/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 09/30/2021, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE NOTICE - FIRST AM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

9/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/27/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Complaint

8/30/2021: Complaint

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/14/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

10/13/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/13/2021: Cross-Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Daniel De Sloover (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Daniel De Sloover (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:29 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 09/30/2021, Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Notice - First Amended General Order in Re LASC Mandatory Electronic Filing for Civil - Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipul...); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 12:08 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of 09/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS VANESSA O.