This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2022 at 12:08:08 (UTC).

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMAZON COM SERVICES LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are H. JAY FORD III and ELAINE W. MANDEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0156

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

H. JAY FORD III

ELAINE W. MANDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendants

AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC

AUBERT CHRISTIAN

GABLER JOHN

GABLER PEGGY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIDIAN LINA S.

Defendant Attorneys

MANDELL BARBARA J.

CYR JONATHAN P

FENG SIMON M.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/14/2022

9/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/14/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

9/30/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/01/2022

8/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/01/2022

Case Management Statement

8/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

7/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Answer

7/11/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

7/11/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/11/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

7/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Case Management Statement

7/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/25/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

General Denial

4/29/2022: General Denial

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • Hearing12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: PEGGY ANN GABLER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department N - Hon. Craig D. Karlan; Reason: Challenge / Recusal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 09/14/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P updated: Result Date to 09/14/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department P - Hon. Elaine W. Mandel; Reason: Challenge / Recusal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTIAN AUBERT (Defendant); Service Date: 03/15/2022; Service Cost: 141.89; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 03/17/2022; Service Cost: 116.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (Defendant); JOHN GABLER (Defendant); PEGGY ANN GABLER (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (Defendant); JOHN GABLER (Defendant); PEGGY ANN GABLER (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (Defendant); JOHN GABLER (Defendant); PEGGY ANN GABLER (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (Defendant); JOHN GABLER (Defendant); PEGGY ANN GABLER (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. H. Jay Ford III in Department O Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIDIAN LINA S. ESQ.