This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 06:04:56 (UTC).

FARIBAR HEJAZI VS CVS HEALTH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 FARIBAR HEJAZI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CVS HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5608

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEJAZI FARIBAR

Defendants

CVS HEALTH

CVS PHARMACY

CVS CAREMARK

CVS PHARMACY INC.

CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS LLC

CVS PHARMACY INC. AGENT FOR CVS RX SERVICES INC. 050501917

CVS RX SERVICES INC.

CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EBRAHIMIAN N. NICK

Defendant Attorney

HAEFFELE ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA

6/2/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT OF CIVIL ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA

6/2/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT OF CIVIL ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA

Answer

5/28/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/23/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/24/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court (FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA); Filed by CVS HEALTH (Defendant); CVS RX SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); CVS PHARMACY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court (OF CIVIL ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA); Filed by CVS HEALTH (Defendant); CVS RX SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); CVS PHARMACY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CVS HEALTH (Defendant); CVS RX SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); CVS PHARMACY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Faribar Hejazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Faribar Hejazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Faribar Hejazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Faribar Hejazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Faribar Hejazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Faribar Hejazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Faribar Hejazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Faribar Hejazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Faribar Hejazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Faribar Hejazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Faribar Hejazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CVS/CAREMARK RHODE ISLAND CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS RX SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Health Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant