This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 18:22:17 (UTC).

FARIBA JAVAHERIAN VS 1145 TOWNE AVENUE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 FARIBA JAVAHERIAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 1145 TOWNE AVENUE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1528

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAVAHERIAN FARIBA

Defendants

1145 TOWNE AVENUE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

1001 S. OLIVE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SORRENTO COMMERCIAL GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

1145 TOWNE IA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SORRENTO COMMERCIAL GROUP LLC

1145 TOWNE AVENUE LLC

1145 TOWNE IA LLC

1001 S. OLIVE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUBMAN MICHAEL E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/28/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/30/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

1/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by FARIBA JAVAHERIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FARIBA JAVAHERIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FARIBA JAVAHERIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FARIBA JAVAHERIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUBMAN MICHAEL ELLIOT