This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2021 at 04:39:13 (UTC).

FARIBA HENDIZADEH VS CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 FARIBA HENDIZADEH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2997

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENDIZADEH FARIBA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAZARUS PETER MICHAEL

HOLLOMON MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

CLANCEY CLIFFORD A.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/19/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

3/23/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

3/23/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/26/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2024
  • Hearing01/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Hearing07/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Fariba Hendizadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fariba Hendizadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fariba Hendizadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fariba Hendizadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lazarus, Peter M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLOMAN MICHAEL P