This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 03:40:43 (UTC).

FARIBA COHEN VS ESTATE OF STEPHEN A. KOLODNY AKA STEPHEN KOLODNY, BY AND THROUGH LAILA KOLODNY, AS EXECUTOR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 FARIBA COHEN filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ESTATE OF STEPHEN A KOLODNY AKA STEPHEN KOLODNY, BY AND THROUGH LAILA KOLODNY, AS EXECUTOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9815

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN FARIBA

Defendants

KOLODNY JEFFREY SCOTT

KOLODNY LAILA

MOHAMMED KARIM NAGI

STEPHEN A. KOLODNY A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

KOLODNY LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

KOLODNY HOWARD LEE

ESTATE OF STEPHEN A. KOLODNY AKA STEPHEN KOLODNY BY AND THROUGH LAILA KOLODNY AS EXECUTOR

KOLODNY FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEICHTER KEVIN J.

HEWITT ANDREW ETHAN

Defendant Attorneys

ALCUMBRAC MARTA

MILEKIC NADJA

Other Attorneys

HEWITT ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Request for Judicial Notice

8/26/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/6/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/6/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO ESTATE OF STEPHEN A. KOLODNY DEMURRER

8/10/2021: Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO ESTATE OF STEPHEN A. KOLODNY DEMURRER

Request for Judicial Notice

6/21/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Sanctions

6/21/2021: Motion for Sanctions

Request for Judicial Notice

5/24/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service by Mail

5/26/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Ruling

5/11/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/9/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/15/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/20/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/30/2020: Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 08:31 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Hearing11/10/2021 at 08:31 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 08:31 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other Joinder to Demurrer of Estate of Stephen A. Kolodny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by Karim Nagi Mohammed (Defendant); Munira Nagi (Defendant); Reda Nagi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Karim Nagi Mohammed (Defendant); Munira Nagi (Defendant); Reda Nagi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Karim Nagi Mohammed iso Motion to Quash Service of Summons); Filed by Karim Nagi Mohammed (Defendant); Munira Nagi (Defendant); Reda Nagi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketJoinder to Motion (to Estate of Stephen A. Kolodny Demurrer); Filed by Kolodny Family Trust dated October 12, 2015, by and through Laila Kolodny, Its Trustee (Defendant); Laila Kolodny (Defendant); Jeffrey Scott Kolodny (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Fariba Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference); Filed by Fariba Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Fariba Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Fariba Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Fariba Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fariba Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fariba Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fariba Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOLODNY LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEWITT ANDREW E.