This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 01:29:42 (UTC).

FARHAD ORNONPAR VS WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 FARHAD ORNONPAR filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0671

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORNONPAR FARHAD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHOURI NATALIE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSTEIN JENNIFER M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Cross-Complaint

4/8/2020: Cross-Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

4/8/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/8/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/8/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/14/2020: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/7/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by FARHAD ORNONPAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (to Cross-Complaint); Filed by WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FARHAD ORNONPAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FARHAD ORNONPAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FARHAD ORNONPAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FARHAD ORNONPAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSTEIN JENNIFER M. ESQ.