This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 07:55:37 (UTC).

FARHAD MOOSSAZADEH, ET AL. VS HERSEL MANGOLI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 FARHAD MOOSSAZADEH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HERSEL MANGOLI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0452

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOOSSAZADEH NAHAL

MOOSSAZADEH FARHAD

Defendants

HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION INC.

MANGOLI HERSEL AKA HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALDWELL SUSAN L.

Defendant Attorney

BEROKIM KOUSHA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROGATORIES (FORM) - CONSTRUC...)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROGATORIES (FORM) - CONSTRUC...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (REQUESTED BY PLAINTIFFS) AND DISCOVERY REFEREE

4/14/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (REQUESTED BY PLAINTIFFS) AND DISCOVERY REFEREE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROGATORIES - FORM - GENERAL,...)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROGATORIES - FORM - GENERAL,...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE 1/15/21 MOTIONS TO COMPEL HEARINGS

1/11/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE 1/15/21 MOTIONS TO COMPEL HEARINGS

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL (CORRECTED-INCLUDES EXHIBIT 13)

12/29/2020: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL (CORRECTED-INCLUDES EXHIBIT 13)

Notice - NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION

12/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF FARHADL MOOSSAZADEH TO HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION MOTION TO COMPEL SPEC ROGS

12/24/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF FARHADL MOOSSAZADEH TO HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION MOTION TO COMPEL SPEC ROGS

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF FARHAD MOOSSAZADEH TO MANGOLI MOTION TO COMPEL FORM ROGS (GENERAL)

12/24/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF FARHAD MOOSSAZADEH TO MANGOLI MOTION TO COMPEL FORM ROGS (GENERAL)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF FARHAD MOOSSAZADEH TO HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION MOTION TO COMPEL RFP

12/24/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF FARHAD MOOSSAZADEH TO HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION MOTION TO COMPEL RFP

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF FARHAD MOOSSAZADEH TO MANGOLI MOTION TO COMPEL RFA (AND DEEM ADMITTED)

12/24/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF FARHAD MOOSSAZADEH TO MANGOLI MOTION TO COMPEL RFA (AND DEEM ADMITTED)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF NAHAL MOOSSAZADEH TO HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS

12/24/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF NAHAL MOOSSAZADEH TO HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT FURTHER DISCOVERY) - 1 MOVING PARTY, 1 MOTION REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SET ONE) FROM NAHAL MOOSSAZADEH AND REQUEST FOR SANCTION IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,0

9/16/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT FURTHER DISCOVERY) - 1 MOVING PARTY, 1 MOTION REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SET ONE) FROM NAHAL MOOSSAZADEH AND REQUEST FOR SANCTION IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,0

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT FURTHER DISCOVERY) - 1 MOVING PARTY, 1 MOTION FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL (SET ONE) FRON FARHAD MOOSSAZADEH AND REQUEST FOR SANCTION IN THE AMOUN

9/15/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT FURTHER DISCOVERY) - 1 MOVING PARTY, 1 MOTION FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL (SET ONE) FRON FARHAD MOOSSAZADEH AND REQUEST FOR SANCTION IN THE AMOUN

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/6/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

5/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Referee; Filed by Hersel Mangoli (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for protective order) - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Production (Set One) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Production ((Set One)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Production ((Set One)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
158 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Farhad Moossazadeh (Plaintiff); Nahal Moossazadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Hersel Mangoli (Defendant); Hershel Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Proof of Personal Service of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Farhad Moossazadeh (Plaintiff); Nahal Moossazadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Proof of Personal Service of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Farhad Moossazadeh (Plaintiff); Nahal Moossazadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Farhad Moossazadeh (Plaintiff); Nahal Moossazadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint (for Damages); Filed by Farhad Moossazadeh (Plaintiff); Nahal Moossazadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Farhad Moossazadeh (Plaintiff); Nahal Moossazadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALDWELL SUSAN L.