This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 14:51:06 (UTC).

FARHAD DORRANI VS DEBORAH ORTEGA, ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 FARHAD DORRANI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DEBORAH ORTEGA, ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are VIRGINIA KEENY and PAUL A. BACIGALUPO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0744

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

VIRGINIA KEENY

PAUL A. BACIGALUPO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DORRANI FARHAD

Defendant

ORTEGA ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE DEBORAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNAUSS JOANNE MIRRAS

 

Court Documents

Request for Judicial Notice

4/1/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Witness List

4/4/2022: Witness List

Exhibit List

4/4/2022: Exhibit List

Trial Brief

4/7/2022: Trial Brief

Trial Brief

4/7/2022: Trial Brief

Trial Brief

4/7/2022: Trial Brief

Notice of Lis Pendens

4/8/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens

Request for Judicial Notice

4/8/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAY EST.))

4/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAY EST.))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAY EST.))

4/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAY EST.))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAY EST.))

4/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAY EST.))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAY EST.))

4/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAY EST.))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC) - (CASE INFOR SENT TO B))

1/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC) - (CASE INFOR SENT TO B))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/12/2021

10/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/12/2021

Case Management Statement

10/1/2021: Case Management Statement

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • Hearing05/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((3-5 day est.)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (3-5 day est.))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((3-5 day est.)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (3-5 day est.))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((3-5 day est.)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (3-5 day est.))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((3-5 day est.)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (3-5 day est.))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 10/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by FARHAD DORRANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by DEBORAH ORTEGA, ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DEBORAH ORTEGA, ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by FARHAD DORRANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FARHAD DORRANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FARHAD DORRANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FARHAD DORRANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNAUSS JOANNE MIRRAS