Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2020 at 00:39:22 (UTC).

FARAMAZ BARDI, ET AL. VS MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INC., A CORPORATION,

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 FARAMAZ BARDI filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER SMITH, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0399

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARDI FARAMAZ

LALEH BARDI AS A TRUSTEE OF THE BARDI FAMILY TRUST

FARMAZ BARDI AS A TRUSTEE OF THE BARDI FAMILY TRUST

BARDI LALEH

Defendant

MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUSSMAN MARC IRWIN

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF FARAMAZ BARDI AND LALEH BARDI

6/10/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF FARAMAZ BARDI AND LALEH BARDI

Order - Dismissal

9/18/2020: Order - Dismissal

Complaint

12/28/2018: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/06/2020

5/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/06/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

6/17/2019: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

6/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/22/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Request - REQUEST FOR EXEMPTION FROM MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE

3/13/2019: Request - REQUEST FOR EXEMPTION FROM MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

4/3/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/5/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN HOGUE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/5/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN HOGUE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

3/7/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER NUN PRO TUNC CHANGING THE DATE OF THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT TO DECEMBER 28, 2018

3/8/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER NUN PRO TUNC CHANGING THE DATE OF THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT TO DECEMBER 28, 2018

Case Management Statement

3/21/2019: Case Management Statement

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Status Conference (ReArbitration) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INC., A CORPORATION, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Status Conference (ReArbitration) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Status Conference (ReArbitration) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:40 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 3:04 PM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Nunc Pro Tunc Ch...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for an order nun pro tunc changing the date of the filing of the complaint to December 28, 2018); Filed by FARAMAZ BARDI (Plaintiff); LALEH BARDI (Plaintiff); FARMAZ BARDI AS A TRUSTEE OF THE BARDI FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by FARAMAZ BARDI (Plaintiff); LALEH BARDI (Plaintiff); FARMAZ BARDI AS A TRUSTEE OF THE BARDI FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by FARAMAZ BARDI (Plaintiff); LALEH BARDI (Plaintiff); FARMAZ BARDI AS A TRUSTEE OF THE BARDI FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by FARAMAZ BARDI (Plaintiff); LALEH BARDI (Plaintiff); FARMAZ BARDI AS A TRUSTEE OF THE BARDI FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FARAMAZ BARDI (Plaintiff); LALEH BARDI (Plaintiff); FARMAZ BARDI AS A TRUSTEE OF THE BARDI FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FARAMAZ BARDI (Plaintiff); LALEH BARDI (Plaintiff); FARMAZ BARDI AS A TRUSTEE OF THE BARDI FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FARAMAZ BARDI (Plaintiff); LALEH BARDI (Plaintiff); FARMAZ BARDI AS A TRUSTEE OF THE BARDI FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zussman, Marc Irwin