Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2021 at 05:36:12 (UTC).

FARAMARZ TALEHAKIMI VS MARTIN NOLASCO ALVAREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 FARAMARZ TALEHAKIMI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTIN NOLASCO ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3077

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TALEHAKIMI FARAMARZ

Defendants

ALVAREZ SALES INC.

ALVAREZ MARTIN NOLASCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OKHOVAT AIDIN

Defendant Attorney

ARNOLD COURTNEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/12/2021: Answer

Answer

4/6/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

12/11/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Hearing05/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Martin Nolasco Alvarez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Martin Nolasco Alvarez (Defendant); Alvarez Sales, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alvarez Sales, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Faramarz Talehakimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Faramarz Talehakimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Faramarz Talehakimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OKHOVAT AIDIN